FL H0869 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1004 (Ch. 2016-178)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1004 (Ch. 2016-178)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises exceptions to public records exemption for security system plans; provides exceptions to public records exemption for information relating to certain security systems.
Title
Public Records/Security Systems Plans and Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1004 (Ch. 2016-178) |
2016-03-07 | House | Substituted CS/SB 1004 |
2016-03-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/16 |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-10 | House | CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-10 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-10 | House | CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/10/16, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2016-02-03 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/03/16, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-25 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-22 | House | CS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-20 | House | CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-15 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 01/20/16, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-12-18 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2015-12-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1004 (Similar To) 2016-04-01 - Chapter No. 2016-178
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
119 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
281 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |