FL H0867 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Implements proposed amendment to State Constitution; exempts assessed value of certain renewable energy source devices from tangible personal property tax; prohibits consideration of installation of such devices in determination of assessed value of real property for ad valorem taxation purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewable Energy Source Devices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Finance and Tax Committee
2015-03-12HouseNow in Finance and Tax Committee
2015-03-12HouseFavorable by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2015-03-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 03/12/15, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-26HouseReferred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-02-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0865 (Related) 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
S0402 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs
S0400 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
193155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1931554Amended CodeSee Bill Text
193624Amended CodeSee Bill Text
196182Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback