FL H0839 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-111
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits municipality, county, special district, or political subdivision from taking certain actions to prohibit siting, development, or redevelopment of fuel retailers & related transportation infrastructure & from requiring fuel retailers to install or invest in particular fueling infrastructure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Express Preemption of Fuel Retailers and Related Transportation Infrastructure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#226 (Y: 79 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-17 Chapter No. 2021-111
2021-06-16 Approved by Governor
2021-06-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-26HouseOrdered enrolled
2021-04-26HouseIn Messages
2021-04-26SenateCS passed; YEAS 26 NAYS 12
2021-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-22SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-22SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 856
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-22SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2021-04-21SenateReceived
2021-04-21SenateReferred to Rules
2021-04-21SenateIn Messages
2021-04-21HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-21HouseCS passed; YEAS 79, NAYS 38
2021-04-21HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-20HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-20HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-15HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021)
2021-04-14HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-14HouseBill released to House Calendar
2021-04-14HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2021-04-14HouseFavorable by Commerce Committee
2021-04-12HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-04-05HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-04-05HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-04-05House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2021-04-02HouseCS Filed
2021-04-02HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-02HouseReported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-04-01HouseFavorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-03-30HousePCS added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-12HouseNow in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-03-12HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-12HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-03-10House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-10HouseCS Filed
2021-03-10HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-10HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-09HouseFavorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-05HousePCS added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-03-01HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-02-22HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S856 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 839

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
377707Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/839
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/839/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/839/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/839/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/839/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/839/Amendment/811719/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/839/Analyses/h0839.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/839/Analyses/h0839a.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/839/Analyses/h0839b.LAV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/839/Analyses/h0839c.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/839/Analyses/h0839d.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/839/Analyses/h0839z.TIE.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/839/Vote/HouseVote_h00839c2226.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/839/Vote/SenateVote_h00839c2010.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=57799&IsPCB=1&BillId=71648
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59872&IsPCB=1&BillId=71648
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60266&IsPCB=0&BillId=71648

Bill Comments 750

feedback