FL H0837 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires law enforcement agencies to review certain cold cases upon receiving written application from designated person & make specified determination; provides requirements for such reviews; requires law enforcement agencies to conduct full reinvestigation of cold case; provides requirements for such reinvestigations; requires certain procedures to ensure compliance; requires law enforcement agencies to provide specified training; requires law enforcement agencies to provide written confirmation of receipt of application; requires written explanation of reason or reasons for denial; provides timeframe & notice requirements; requires law enforcement agencie to report certain data to Global Forensic & Justice Center at FIU; requires coordination between law enforcement agencies if more than one law enforcement agency conducted initial investigation;; authorizes medical examiner to issue death certificates with nonspecific causes of death & manner of murder.
Title
Cold Case Murders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-27 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-12-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S350 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/837 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/837/BillText/Filed/PDF |