FL H0837 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises Insurers Rehabilitation & Liquidation Act; revises notice requirements, court jurisdiction, filing requirements, procedures, & defenses of delinquency proceedings; authorizes receiver & DFS, as domiciliary receiver, to perform certain functions; provides delinquency procedures for specified large deductible claims under certain workers' compensation policies; provides certain persons of insolvent insurers are discharged & have no further authority over affairs or assets of insurer; revises priority of claims.
Title
Insurer Insolvency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#249 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#249 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Chapter No. 2017-143 | |
2017-06-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-06-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-03 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-05-03 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 730 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-26 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time 874 |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-11 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-11 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-06 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/06/17, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2017-03-28 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2017-03-20 | House | Now in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-03-16 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-16 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-14 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/14/17, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0730 (Same As) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2017-143)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
631 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 1521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 1522 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 271 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 391 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 397 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |