FL H0831 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires students to earn one-half credit in health education for high school graduation; authorizes waiver for students who request to take & successfully complete health education assessment; reduces number of required credits in elective courses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High School Graduation Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05HouseDied in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
2017-05-05HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-02-23HouseReferred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2017-02-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0392 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages
S1026 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education
H0955 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10034282Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback