FL H0829 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Removes obsolete language; revises student eligibility criteria & school district, parent, & student obligations; specifies method of calculating scholarship amounts for certain students.
Title
The John M. McKay Scholarships for Students with Disabilities Program
Sponsors
House PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee | Rep. Rene Plasencia [R] | Rep. Mel Ponder [R] | Rep. Larry Ahern [R] |
Rep. Julio Gonzalez [R] | Rep. Patricia Hawkins-Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-25 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2018-01-24 | House | CS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-24 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-23 | House | CS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-19 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 9:00 am, Mashburn Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-08 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2017-11-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1080 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/829 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/829/BillText/Filed/PDF |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/829/BillText/c1/PDF |