FL H0827 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Levies surcharge on admission charges for professional sporting events; defines "professional sporting event"; provides that certain admissions are exempt from surcharge; requires DOR to administer, collect, & enforce surcharge; provides for deposit & use of surcharge proceeds for high school interscholastic athletic programs; provides formula for allocating funds among school districts & high schools.
Title
Funding for High School Interscholastic Athletic Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Finance and Tax Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; K-12 Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2015-12-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0980 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/827 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0827/BillText/Filed/PDF |