FL H0817 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that Commission on Ethics & Florida Elections Commission notify Chief Financial Officer (CFO) or governing body of county, municipality, or special district of any unpaid fines levied against person who has been elected to state, county, municipal, or special district office; requires CFO or governing body of county, municipality, or special district to withhold salary payments that would otherwise be paid to elected official when that official owes fine to Commission on Ethics or Florida Elections Commission; authorizes CFO or governing body to retain percentage of payment for administrative costs.
Title
Elected Officials
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 80 | |
2011-12-12 | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Rules and Calendar Committee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 80 | |
2011-11-30 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/817 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0817/BillText/Filed/HTML |