FL H0813 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-157
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-157
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires securities dealers, investment advisers, & associated persons to report knowledge or suspicion of abuse, neglect, or exploitation of vulnerable adults to DCF; authorizes dealers & investment advisers to delay certain disbursements or transactions based on reasonable belief of financial exploitation of specified adult; requires dealer or investment adviser to notify certain persons & OFR of such delays within specified timeframe; authorizes dealer or investment adviser to extend delay; provides that length of such delays may be shortened or extended by court of competent jurisdiction; provides immunity from administrative & civil liability for dealers, investment advisers, & associated persons; requires dealers & investment advisers to develop certain training policies or programs & maintain written records of compliance.
Title
Protection of Vulnerable Investors
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Insurance and Banking Subcommittee | Rep. Lawrence McClure [R] | Rep. David Silvers [D] |
Rep. Kamia Brown [D] | Rep. Daniel Perez [R] | Rep. Ardian Zika [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#451 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#451 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Chapter No. 2020-157 | |
2020-06-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-12 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-12 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1672 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-02-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-02-20 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-02-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20 |
2020-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-10 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-10 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-06 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/06/20, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-01-29 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Favorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/29/20, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2020-01-20 | House | Now in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee |
2020-01-16 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-16 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-15 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-11-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1672 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 813
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 1034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |