FL H0809 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Division of Recreation & Parks within DEP to create by rule state park annual entrance pass program to provide free passes to persons who perform certain volunteer work.
Title
State Park Fees
Sponsors
Rep. Melony Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S590 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/809 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/809/BillText/Filed/PDF |