FL H0809 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates Energy Affordability Trust Fund within DCA; provides purpose of trust fund & source of funds.; provides for future review & termination or re-creation of trust fund.
Title
Energy Affordability Trust Fund/DCA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 70 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 70 | |
2011-02-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0772 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H0807 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0770 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H0807 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0770 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/809 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0809/BillText/Filed/HTML |