FL H0807 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-150
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-150
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires civics education instructional materials be reviewed & approved by Commissioner of Education in consultation with certain entities & individuals; provides duties of commissioner; requires commissioner to review & provide recommendations for certain instructional materials & test specifications; requires DOE to review statewide civics education course standards.
Title
Civics Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#246 (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#246 (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Chapter No. 2019-150 | |
2019-06-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-06-25 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-05-03 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2019-05-03 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1480 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Education; Rules |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Education; Rules |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-25 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 111 NAYS 1 |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (284337) |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19 |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-03-29 | House | CS by Education Committee read 1st time |
2019-03-29 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-28 | House | CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1 |
2019-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/28/19, 8:30 am, Reed Hall |
2019-03-20 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/20/19, 9:00 am, 116 Knott Building |
2019-03-07 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 03/07/19, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1480 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 807 (Ch. 2019-150)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 4156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |