FL H0807 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to Emergency Communications Number E911 System; revises provisions for administration, distribution, & use of E911 fee; provides for prepaid wireless E911 fee; revises provisions for accounting, distribution, use, & auditing of Emergency Communications Number E911 System Fund. APPROPRIATION:
Title
Emergency Communication System
Sponsors
Rep. Eduardo Gonzalez [R] | House Regulatory Affairs Committee | House Finance and Tax Subcommittee | Sen. Greg Steube [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#292 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Regulated Industries; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2013-04-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-26 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-23 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/13 |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | CS/CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-04 | House | CS/CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/04/13, 10:30 am, 404 HOB |
2013-03-26 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-03-25 | House | CS by Finance and Tax Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-25 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-20 | House | CS by Finance and Tax Subcommittee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Subcommittee, 03/20/13, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2013-03-12 | House | Now in Finance and Tax Subcommittee |
2013-03-12 | House | Favorable by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 03/12/13, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
365 | 172 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
365 | 173 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |