FL H0805 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides requirements for unattended donation bins operated by charitable organizations; requires certain signage; requires that charitable organization receive specified percentage of donated property.
Title
Charitable Organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 69 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 70 | |
2011-02-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0902 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/805 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0805/BillText/Filed/HTML |