FL H0789 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendment to s. 4, Art. VII of State Constitution to authorize counties & municipalities to limit assessed value of homesteads of certain low-income senior citizens.
Title
Homestead Assessment Limitation/Senior Citizens
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#456 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#455 (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#455 (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-05-02 | In Messages | |
2011-05-02 | Read 3rd time -HJ 993 | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time -HJ 951 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/11 | |
2011-04-22 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 766 | |
2011-04-21 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 766 | |
2011-04-19 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/21/11, 11:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2011-04-15 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 658 | |
2011-04-14 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-12 | CS/CS by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 -HJ 644 | |
2011-04-07 | CS by Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 586 | |
2011-04-08 | Now in Finance and Tax Committee -HJ 600 | |
2011-04-07 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-01 | CS by Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 453 | |
2011-03-30 | On Committee agenda-- Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 04/01/11, 8:45 am, Webster Hall | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 67 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 67 | |
2011-02-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0808 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration