FL H0777 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-20 - Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee Committee
Hearing: Jan 24 @ 1:00 pm House Ways & Means Committee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires referenda elections related to tourist development taxes, tourist impact taxes, children's services & independent special district property taxes, increases in county & municipal ad valorem tax millages, ninth-cent fuel tax, local option fuel taxes, & certain school district millage elections to be held on day of general elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Tax Referenda Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-12 - House - House Public Integrity & Elections Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Public Integrity & Elections Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-20HouseAdded to Ways & Means Committee agenda
2022-01-14HouseNow in Ways & Means Committee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to Ways & Means Committee
2022-01-13House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2022-01-13HouseCS Filed
2022-01-13HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2022-01-13HouseReported out of Public Integrity & Elections Committee
2022-01-12HouseFavorable with CS by Public Integrity & Elections Committee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseAdded to Public Integrity & Elections Committee agenda
2021-12-13HouseNow in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
2021-12-13HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-12-13HouseReferred to Ways & Means Committee
2021-12-13HouseReferred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee
2021-11-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1194 (Same As) 2022-01-20 - Now in Finance and Tax

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101173Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1250104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1250108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
125901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
200091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
200101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
336021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
336025Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback