FL H0769 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition of term "renewable energy source device."
Title
Assessment of Renewable Energy Source Devices
Sponsors
House Ways & Means Committee | House Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee | Rep. Doug Bankson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Commerce Committee |
2024-02-12 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2024-02-12 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-09 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-09 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-09 | House | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda |
2024-01-23 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2024-01-23 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-01-23 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2024-01-22 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-22 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-22 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-22 | House | Reported out of Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee |
2024-01-19 | House | Favorable with CS by Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee |
2024-01-17 | House | Added to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-19 | House | Now in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee |
2023-12-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7073 (Similar To) 2024-05-08 - Chapter No. 2024-158; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 328 (Ch. 2024-188)
S7074 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7073
S7074 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7073