FL H0769 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that assessments for qualifying improvements do not have priority over previously recorded liens; specifies information to be included in financing agreements; requires local governments to provide certain disclosures in finance agreements; requires lenders to include certain disclosures in loan agreements; authorizes property owner to cancel finance agreement within specified time period; revises terms applicable to Florida Security for Public Deposits Act to add credit unions to list of entities that may qualify as "qualified public depository"; revises evidence of insurance required to be submitted by public depositor to CFO.
Title
Public Deposits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-08 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-11-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1258 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
136 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
175 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
175 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
185 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
185 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
190 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
191 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
24 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
255 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
331 | 309 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 553 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 06115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/769 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/769/BillText/Filed/PDF |