FL H0767 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating "Property Insurance Appraisal Umpire Law"; provides licensing requirements, continuing education requirements & prohibited acts for umpires; revises the Florida Insurance Code to include umpires; authorizes DFS to refuse, suspend, or revoke umpire's license under certain circumstances; providing appropriation & authorizing positions.
Title
Property Insurance Appraisers and Property Insurance Appraisal Umpires
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0094 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
624 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 523 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 2815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 541 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 621 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 641 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 7845 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 8305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 8411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 8443 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 854 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 8791 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9957 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9961 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9962 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9963 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9964 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9965 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9966 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9967 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9968 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 70151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/767 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0767/BillText/Filed/PDF |