FL H0765 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires movers to conduct physical surveys & provide disclosures & binding estimates; provides for certain waivers; provides that failure to comply with certain provisions violates ch. 507, F.S.; provides criminal penalties; requires DACS to adopt rules & prepare publication regarding rights & responsibilities of, & remedies available to, movers & shippers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Household Moving Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied on Calendar
2015-04-28HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2015-04-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/15
2015-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-04-16HouseCS/CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time
2015-04-16HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-04-14HouseCS/CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2015-04-10HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-04-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/14/15, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2015-04-10HouseNow in Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-04-10HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-04-07HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-04-03HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/07/15, 4:30 pm, Reed Hall
2015-03-17HouseNow in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2015-03-17HouseFavorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-03-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/17/15, 12:30 pm, 12 HOB
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-26HouseReferred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-02-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0798 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
50701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
507045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
507054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
507055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
507065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
507066Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50707Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50709Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50711Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50714Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback