FL H0753 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises period required for secondary metals recyclers to maintain certain information about transactions; revises requirements for types of information that must be maintained regarding transactions; provide for method of payment for restricted regulated metals property; prohibits secondary metals recyclers from purchasing regulated metals property without maintaining certain records; deletes provisions prohibiting purchase of regulated metals property from certain persons or at certain locations, etc.
Title
Secondary Metals Recyclers
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Ford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 65 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 65 | |
2011-02-15 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1528 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
319 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
319 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
538 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
538 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
538 | 235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
538 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/753 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0753/BillText/Filed/HTML |