FL H0749 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-169
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-169
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that electronic credentialing system display certain vehicle information, provide notification, & allow drivers to update information; requires DHSMV to provide Legislature with recommendations for compliance verification with financial responsibility requirements; requires certain sellers to allow consumers to cancel in specified manner & by specified means service contracts that have automatic renewal provisions; revises maximum fines for public adjusters & public adjuster apprentices; revises requirements for advertisements issued or caused to be issued by service agreement companies or salespersons; provides transfer of funds & appropriation.
Title
Fraud Prevention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#683 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#683 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Chapter No. 2022-169 | |
2022-06-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-05-20 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-04 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-04 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1292 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-03-02 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-03-02 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-24 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3) |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022) |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2022-02-16 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-16 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-15 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-15 | House | Favorable with CS by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-11 | House | Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-25 | House | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-24 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-21 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-21 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-21 | House | Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2022-01-19 | House | Favorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2022-01-14 | House | Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-13 | House | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-11-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1292 (Same As) 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 749
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
324 | 252 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 854 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 126 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |