FL H0745 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Rules and Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Rules and Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates sport of automobile racing as official state sport.
Title
State Symbols
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Rules and Calendar Committee | |
2012-02-27 | On Committee agenda-- Rules and Calendar Committee, 02/27/12, 4:15 pm, 404 HOB --Temporarily deferred | |
2012-02-22 | Now in Rules and Calendar Committee -HJ 738 | |
2012-02-22 | Favorable by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 4 -HJ 738 | |
2012-02-20 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/22/12, 9:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 73 | |
2011-11-29 | Referred to State Affairs Committee; Rules and Calendar Committee -HJ 73 | |
2011-11-22 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/745 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0745/BillText/Filed/HTML |