FL H0739 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition of term "continuing contract," & defines term "best value selection"; clarifies provisions with respect to selection of firms by agency under competitive selection process; provides that agency has right to reject any or all submissions received in response to public announcement under competitive selection process; authorizes agency to award contracts to multiple firms under competitive negotiation process; provides for best value selection process; requires agencies to adopt rules governing use of such process; provides minimum requirements with respect to best value selection procedures.
Title
Procurement of Professional Architectural, Engineering, Landscape Architectural, or Surveying and Mapping Services
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Metz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Rulemaking Oversight and Repeal Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2013-02-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1002 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/739 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0739/BillText/Filed/PDF |