FL H0739 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to home health agencies with regard to duties of administrator, alternate administrator, & director of nursing & training requirements for home health aide; requires written contract between home health agency & certain personnel; permits other entities under contract with home health agency to provide services; provides supervisory responsibilities of agency if another entity provides services, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC)
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00068
2010-02-05 Referred to Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council
2010-01-19 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S2138 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
H1503 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
S2434 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00896; Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 1143 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00896; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5301 (Ch. 2010-156), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102) -SJ 00896
S2586 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation
S0760 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0400462Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0400476Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0400487Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0400933Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0400969Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0408805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
042941Amended CodeSee Bill Text
042965Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback