FL H0737 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies period during 2012 when sales of clothing, wallets, bags, & school supplies are exempt from sales tax; provides exceptions; authorizes DOR to adopt emergency rules; provides appropriation. APPROPRIATION:
Title
Tax on Sales, Use, and Other Transactions
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Abruzzo [D] | Rep. Marti Coley [R] | House Finance and Tax Committee | Rep. Martin Kiar [D] |
Rep. Jeanette Nunez [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Porter [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#29 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#735 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#735 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch. | |
2012-02-28 | Conference Committee appointed: Budget Conference Committee on Budget/Appropriations: Alexander (Chair), Negron (Vice Chair), Bennett (At Large), Gaetz (At Large), Gardiner (At Large), Joyner (At Large), Rich (At Large), Thrasher (At Large); Budget Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Bogdanoff (Chair), Evers, Smith, Storms; Budget Conference Committee on Education Pre-K - 12/PreK-12: Simmons (Chair), Detert, Gardiner, Montford, Ring; Budget Conference Committee on Finance and Tax: Norman (Chair), Alexander, Gaetz, Siplin; Budget Conference Committee on General Government/Government Operations: Hays (Chair), Braynon, Bullard, Diaz de la Portilla, Dockery, Jones, Thrasher; Budget Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Negron (Chair), Fasano, Flores, Garcia, Oelrich, Rich, Richter, Sobel; Budget Conference Committee on Higher Education/Higher Education: Lynn (Chair), Altman, Sachs, Siplin, Wise; Budget Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic | |
2012-02-28 | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Precourt (Chair), Albritton, Caldwell, Costello, Julien, Ray, Randolph, Rooney, Steube, Thurston -HJ 899 | |
2012-02-23 | In returning messages | |
2012-02-23 | Immediately certified -SJ 667 | |
2012-02-23 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 666 | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to Budget -SJ 550 | |
2012-02-21 | Received -SJ 550 | |
2012-02-16 | In Messages | |
2012-02-15 | Requests that the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to conference -HJ 626 | |
2012-02-15 | Read 3rd time -HJ 607 | |
2012-02-14 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-14 | Read 2nd time -HJ 584 | |
2012-02-10 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/12 | |
2012-02-08 | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading -HJ 531 | |
2012-02-06 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/08/12 | |
2012-02-01 | CS by Finance and Tax Committee read 1st time -HJ 314 | |
2012-02-01 | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-26 | CS by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 -HJ 310 | |
2012-01-24 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 01/26/12, 2:30 pm, Morris Hall | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 72 | |
2011-11-29 | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; Appropriations Committee -HJ 72 | |
2011-11-21 | Filed |