FL H0729 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises aggregate value that constitutes small estate account; revises requirements for unclaimed property power of attorney; eliminates maximum fee provision for unclaimed property recovery; repeals provisions relating to unclaimed property powers of attorney & purchase agreements deemed void.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unclaimed Property

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Government Operations Subcommittee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-18HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2015-02-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1026 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Banking and Insurance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7171243Amended CodeSee Bill Text
717135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7171381Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback