FL H0729 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1713
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1713
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that failure to redeliver property or equipment within specified time after receiving demand for return is prima facie evidence of abandonment or refusal to redeliver property or equipment; provides that notice mailed by delivery by courier with tracking capability to address given by renter at time of rental is sufficient & equivalent to notice having been received by renter, if notice is returned undelivered; provides that failure to redeliver property or equipment after rental period expires, & after demand for return is made, is prima facie evidence of abandonment or refusal to redeliver property or equipment; provides that demand for return of overdue property or equipment & for payment of amounts due may be sent by courier service with tracking capability; provides that possession of personal property or equipment by third party does not eliminate lessee's obligation to return such property or equipment according to contract; provides exception when personal property or equipment was obtained without lessee's consent; provides that lessor of vehicle that is not returned at conclusion of lease is entitled to report vehicle as stolen.
Title
Hiring, Leasing, or Obtaining Personal Property or Equipment with the Intent to Defraud
Sponsors
Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] | House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | House Judiciary Committee | Rep. John Julien [D] |
Rep. Raymond Pilon [R] | Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#60 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#854 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#854 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1713 | |
2012-03-09 | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 1239 | |
2012-03-09 | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Banking and Insurance -SJ 1238 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Banking and Insurance -SJ 819 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 819 | |
2012-02-24 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 767 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 767 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-22 | Read 2nd time -HJ 719 | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/12 | |
2012-02-10 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 577 | |
2012-02-09 | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time -HJ 568 | |
2012-02-09 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-08 | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 573 | |
2012-02-06 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/08/12, 8:30 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-17 | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 223 | |
2012-01-17 | Original reference(s) removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | |
2012-01-13 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-12 | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 228 | |
2012-01-10 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/12/12, 8:30 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 71 | |
2011-11-29 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 72 | |
2011-11-21 | Filed |