FL H0727 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes local government to levy non-ad valorem assessments to recover costs incurred in eliminating chronic nuisances on real property; requires local governments that levy assessments to adopt ordinances containing certain provisions; provides for payment and collection of assessments.
Title
Chronic Nuisance Service Assessments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred to Finance and Tax Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Appropriations Committee |
2014-01-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1038 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/727 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0727/BillText/Filed/PDF |