FL H0727 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits automatic expunction of criminal history records in specified circumstances; provides procedures; provides for effect of expunction; provides for treatment of certain statutory cross-references; conforms provisions.
Title
Expunging Criminal History Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 63 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 63 | |
2011-02-14 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1402 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H1369 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H1369 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
943 | 0582 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/727 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0727/BillText/Filed/HTML |