FL H0723 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides motor vehicle insurance requirements for peer-to-peer car sharing; provides that peer-to-peer car-sharing programs have insurable interest in shared vehicles in specified periods; authorizes peer-to-peer car-sharing programs to own & maintain certain policies of motor vehicle insurance; provides liabilities; requires shared vehicle owners' insurers to indemnify peer-to-peer car-sharing programs under certain circumstances; provides exemptions from vicarious liabilities; authorizes motor vehicle insurance policies to exclude specified coverages; authorizes specified insurers to seek contributions against indemnifications; provides requirements for notifications of implications of liens; requires specified disclosures to shared vehicle drivers & owners; provides requirements for verification & notification relating to motor vehicle safety recalls.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peer-to-peer Car Sharing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied on Calendar
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-28HouseCS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
2020-02-28HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-27HouseCS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 4
2020-02-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2020-02-13HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2020-02-13HouseFavorable by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 2
2020-02-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/13/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-30HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-01-30HouseCS referred to State Affairs Committee; Commerce Committee
2020-01-30HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
2020-01-29HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-29HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-28HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1
2020-01-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-12-16HouseReferred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-11-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H377 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
S478 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6277483Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback