FL H0721 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that court may not make equitable distribution of property in dissolution of marriage to party convicted of certain offenses concerning other party; prohibits persons convicted of specified crimes after marriage from receiving alimony; provides that parent who commits specified offenses against minor child shall lose all right to intestate succession in child's estate & all right to administer estate; provides for distribution of that share of estate.
Title
Effects of Crimes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 62 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 62 | |
2011-02-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1050 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/721 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0721/BillText/Filed/HTML |