FL H0719 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides definitions for terms "governmental unit" & "facility"; prohibits governmental unit that contracts for construction, repair, remodeling, or improving of facility from imposing conditions that require, prohibit, encourage, or discourage certain bidders, contractors, or subcontractors from entering into or adhering to agreements with collective bargaining organization; prohibits governmental unit from granting certain awards as condition of certain contracts; prohibits certain terms from being placed in bid specifications, project agreements, or other controlling documents; provides exceptions; revises period during which agency must file protest following certain contract solicitations or awards.
Title
Public Contracting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 70 | |
2011-11-29 | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 70 | |
2011-11-18 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/719 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0719/BillText/Filed/HTML |