FL H0715 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates Student Preparedness Pilot Program to include Duval County School District as one of selected school districts; requires that students in pilot program districts who are 16-18 years of age & do not regularly attend school shall be subject to attendance & completion requirements; requires pilot program districts to identify curricula options; requires annual study & report by OPPAGA.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public School Attendance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 62
2011-02-22 Referred to K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 62
2011-02-10 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0972 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100242Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100243Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100326Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback