FL H0713 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expands coverage of prohibition on battery involving contact with bodily substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Battery Offenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-19 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-08HouseDied in Judiciary Committee
2024-01-19HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2024-01-19HouseReported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2024-01-19HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2024-01-17HouseAdded to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
2024-01-10HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2024-01-10HouseReported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2024-01-10HouseFavorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2024-01-09House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2024-01-08HouseAdded to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda
2023-12-19HouseNow in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2023-12-19HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2023-12-19HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-12-19HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2023-12-04HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
784085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback