FL H0709 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 994 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 994 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides factors for court to consider when appointing guardian; provides guardian may only consent to or authorize do-not-resuscitate order with court approval; provides requirements for petition for appointment of guardian, annual guardianship report, & annual guardianship plan; requires court to make determination on certain petition within specified time; revises provisions relating to conflicts of interest.
Title
Guardianship
Sponsors
House Health and Human Services Committee | Sen. Colleen Burton [R] | Rep. Amy Mercado [D] | Rep. Cindy Polo [D] |
Rep. Emily Slosberg-King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 994 passed |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-03 | House | CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-03 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-30 | House | CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 01/30/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-15 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-12-13 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-12-12 | House | Favorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2019-12-03 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-11-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S994 (Similar To) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-35
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
744 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 3215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 334 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 363 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 367 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 3675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 3725 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 446 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |