FL H0703 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates "Florida Healthy Adolescent Act"; requires public schools that provide information or programs relating to human sexuality to provide information that meets certain criteria; provides for review of certain materials & students to be excused in certain circumstances; repeals certain health education provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education in Public Schools Concerning Human Sexuality

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-13HouseReferred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-02-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S926 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100346Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback