FL H0701 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes county to set interest rate up to maximum allowed by law for certain tax certificates that are not bought.
Title
Unpaid Property Taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Finance and Tax Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Now in Finance and Tax Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Favorable by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-23 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 03/25/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/701 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0701/BillText/Filed/PDF |