FL H0701 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1244
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1244
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that statement offered against party that wrongfully caused declarant's unavailability is not excluded as hearsay.
Title
Florida Evidence Code
Sponsors
Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] | House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Fredrick Costello [R] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R] |
Rep. Doug Holder [R] | Rep. Ana Logan [R] | Rep. Ari Porth [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#57 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1049 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1049 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1244 | |
2012-03-08 | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 1064 | |
2012-03-08 | Receded from 1 amendment(s) (653972) -SJ 1064 | |
2012-03-07 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-07 | Requested Senate to recede -HJ 1169 | |
2012-03-07 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-07 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 909 | |
2012-03-07 | Read 3rd time -SJ 909 | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security -SJ 801 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Judiciary; Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security -SJ 818 | |
2012-03-05 | In Messages | |
2012-03-05 | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 1070 | |
2012-03-05 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1070 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1018 | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 834 | |
2012-02-24 | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 834 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/24/12, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-02-02 | Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 451 | |
2012-02-01 | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 314 | |
2012-02-01 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-31 | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 322 | |
2012-01-27 | PCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 01/31/12, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 68 | |
2011-11-29 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 69 | |
2011-11-16 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
90 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
90 | 804 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |