FL H0699 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-170
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-170
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition of term "Internet identifier"; defines "social Internet communication"; requires sexual predators & sexual offenders to register each Internet identifier's corresponding website homepage or application software name with FDLE through sheriff's office; requires sexual predators & sexual offenders to report any change to certain information after initial in-person registration in specified manner.
Title
Internet Identifiers
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Amber Mariano [R] | Rep. Randy Fine [R] |
Rep. Amy Mercado [D] | Sen. Clay Yarborough [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#322 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#322 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Chapter No. 2017-170 | |
2017-06-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-06-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-04-28 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-04-28 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 684 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2017-04-28 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-28 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time 957 |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-24 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17 |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-24 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/24/17, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-20 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-03-10 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-03-08 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-08 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-08 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/08/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0701 (Related) 2017-05-05 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 699 (Ch. 2017-170)
S0684 (Same As) 2017-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 699 (Ch. 2017-170)
S0686 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 699 (Ch. 2017-170)
S0684 (Same As) 2017-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 699 (Ch. 2017-170)
S0686 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 699 (Ch. 2017-170)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
938 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0437 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 607 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 481 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 4815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |