FL H0697 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires district school boards to provide disability history & awareness instruction in public schools during first week in October; requires individuals certified in disability awareness or exceptional student education teachers to provide instruction; requires Governor's Commission on Disabilities to initiate study on training in disability awareness; requires commission to oversee statewide program for providers of training in disability awareness; requires commission to promote training in disability awareness in all public entities in state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disability Awareness

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 60
2011-02-22 Referred to K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 61
2011-02-09 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0578 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1262 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10034205Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback