FL H0691 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises number of directors allowed for boards of special neighborhood improvement districts; requires local planning ordinances to specify director number & provide for 4-year staggered terms; requires that directors be landowners in proposed area & be subject to certain taxation.
Title
Special Neighborhood Improvement Districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#121 (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-17 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 1 |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-10 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/10/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-04-02 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 04/02/19, 8:30 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-28 | House | Now in Ways and Means Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-27 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-26 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:00 am, 12 HOB |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S854 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
H1081 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
S1508 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
H1081 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
S1508 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice