FL H0691 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires every employer to use Employment Authorization Program to verify employment eligibility of each employee on or after specified date; provides that business that does not use federal E-Verify system to verify employment eligibility of employee shall lose its license to do business in state until business has registered with E-verify system; prohibits employer from employing unauthorized alien; requires every public employer to register with & participate in E-Verify system for specified purposes, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Verification of Employment Eligibility

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 60
2011-02-22 Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 60
2011-02-09 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0518 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
287135Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback