FL H0679 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to exempt from federal income tax payments made to victims of Deepwater Horizon oil disaster & to extend net operating loss carryback period from 2 years to 5 years.
Title
Deepwater Horizon Oil Disaster/Federal Income Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-25 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 325 | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable by Federal Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 325 | |
2011-03-21 | On Committee agenda-- Federal Affairs Subcommittee, 03/23/11, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 59 | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to Federal Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 59 | |
2011-02-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0216 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/679 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0679/BillText/Filed/HTML |