FL H0669 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes City of Palm Bay to apply to OTTED for designation of enterprise zone; provides application deadline; provides requirements for area of enterprise zone; requires OTTED to establish effective date of enterprise zone.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enterprise Zones

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-23 Now in Finance and Tax Committee -HJ 282
2011-03-22 Favorable by Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 282
2011-03-18 On Committee agenda-- Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 03/22/11, 12:00 pm, 12 HOB
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 58
2011-02-22 Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 59
2011-02-08 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1084 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29000726Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback