FL H0661 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires counties to establish maximum rates for storage of electric vehicles; authorizes wrecker operator's storage facility to charge certain costs for certain cleanup, containment, & disposal; specifies financial responsibility for vehicles stored for more than 30 days at wrecker operator's storage facility; authorizes governmental entity to instruct or authorize removal of vehicle or vessel; requires certain communications among governmental entity, DHSMV, & person in charge of location where vehicle or vessel is stored; requires public notice of sale of unclaimed vehicle or vessel to be published in electronic format approved or operated by DHSMV; removes requirement that notice be published in newspaper.
Title
Wrecker Operators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-07 | House | Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2023-12-07 | House | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-12-07 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-12-07 | House | Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2023-11-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S332 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Community Affairs
H179 (Similar To) 2024-03-22 - Chapter No. 2024-27
S774 (Similar To) 2024-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 179
H179 (Similar To) 2024-03-22 - Chapter No. 2024-27
S774 (Similar To) 2024-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 179
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
166 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
323 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 78 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/661 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/661/BillText/Filed/PDF |