FL H0659 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits contracts for sale or lease of consumer goods or services from waiving right of consumer to make certain statements; provides civil penalties; provides construction & applicability.
Title
Contracts for Goods and Services
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Jenne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1212 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/659 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0659/BillText/Filed/PDF |