FL H0647 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-198
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits commission from incurring additional obligations or indebtedness; requires liquidation of assets & satisfaction of existing obligations & indebtedness by a specified date; dissolves commission; corrects cross reference.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hillsborough County Public Transportation Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#330 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28 Chapter No. 2017-198
2017-06-06 Approved by Governor
2017-05-22 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2017-05-04HouseOrdered enrolled
2017-05-04SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2017-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-04SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ
2017-05-04SenateWithdrawn from Rules -SJ
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 05/04/17
2017-04-28SenateReceived
2017-04-28SenateReferred to Rules
2017-04-28SenateIn Messages
2017-04-28HousePassed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
2017-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17
2017-04-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-04-06HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2017-04-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/06/17, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall
2017-03-14HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2017-03-14HouseFavorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2017-03-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 03/14/17, 9:30 am, Reed Hall
2017-03-08HouseNow in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
2017-03-08HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-03-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/08/17, 8:00 am, 12 HOB
2017-02-15HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-02-06HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback