FL H0645 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1178
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1178
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for proprietary business information provided by title insurance agencies & insurers to Office of Insurance Regulation; authorizes disclosure of aggregated information; provides for future review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity; provides for contingent effect.
Title
Pub. Rec./Title Insurance Data/Office of Insurance Regulation
Sponsors
House Government Operations Subcommittee | House Insurance and Banking Subcommittee | Rep. George Moraitis [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#29 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#882 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#882 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1178 | |
2012-03-07 | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 939 | |
2012-03-07 | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 939 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 868 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 868 | |
2012-02-24 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 782 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 782 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-22 | Read 2nd time -HJ 730 | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/12 | |
2012-02-09 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 572 | |
2012-02-08 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 572 | |
2012-02-06 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 02/08/12, 8:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-01-27 | CS/CS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 289 | |
2012-01-27 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 297 | |
2012-01-26 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-25 | CS/CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 299 | |
2012-01-23 | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 243 | |
2012-01-23 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-17 | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 248 | |
2012-01-12 | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/17/12, 3:30 pm, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 64 | |
2011-11-21 | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 64 | |
2011-11-14 | Filed |